Search results
Dec 21, 2021 · Notification : Appointment of Shri Vijay Kumar, IAS(AGMUT:92) as Central Registrar of Cooperative Societies. Submitted by admin on Mon, 12/05/2022 - 10:45. Type.
Feb 14, 2024 · Former IAS officer G.Srkr Vijay Kumar will launch his political party on Wednesday near Mangalagiri. After taking voluntary retirement from service, Vijay Kumar embarked on a padayatra and walked for 142 days covering 2,729 km across 65 assembly constituencies in 12 districts, meeting people to know about their problems.
Jan 6, 2022 · Vijay Kumar, an IAS officer of 1992 batch and Additional Secretary in the Ministry of Cooperation, has been appointed as the Central Registrar of Cooperative Societies with immediate effect. He has a background in Electronics, MBA from Australia, and experience in various Delhi government departments.
Feb 4, 2024 · The 1992 batch Assam-Meghalaya Cadre IAS officer Ashish Bhutani has been appointed as the Secretary, Ministry of Cooperation. The order of his appointment was released on Saturday. He succeeds Gyanesh Kumar, who retired on 31st January 2024.
Aug 1, 2022 · Dr. Vijay Kumar D, IAS : Commissioner & Secretary, Finance Deptt. - 15.10.2018, Planning Deptt. - 15.10.2018, CM’s Secretariat - 06.12.2018, Tourism Deptt. - 12.06.2019, Cooperation Deptt. - 12.06.2019, Sports & Youth Affairs Deptt. - 12.06.2019, Agriculture & Farmers' Welfare Deptt. - 07.06.2021, Urban Affairs Deptt. - 11.04.2023,
NamePresent PostShri Donald Phillips Wahlang, IASChief Secretary to the Govt. of Meghalaya ...Dr. Shakil P. Ahammed, IASAdditional Chief Secretary, Home (Police) ...Shri. Sampath Kumar, IASPrincipal Secretary, Community & Rural ...Shri. Frederick Roy Kharkongor, IASPrincipal Secretary, A.H. & Veterinary ...appoints Shri Vijay Kumar, IAS (AGMUT:92), Additional Secretary (Cooperation) in the Ministry of Cooperation, Government of India as the Central Registrar of Cooperative Societies with immediate effect and until further orders. (F.NO. 1--11012/2/2003-L&M) khar Bose) Under Secretary to the Government of India To The General Manager
People also ask
Who is former IAS officer Vijay Kumar?
Who is Shri Vijayendra Kumar?
Who is Sanjay Kumar?
Who is Vijay Kumar?
Dr. Vijay Kumar D, IAS. Commissioner and Secretary. Address : Main Secretariat Building, Shillong Phone : 0364-2226043 Email ID : dvijaykumar[at]ias[dot]nic[dot]in