Search results
People also ask
Who is the CEO of the Indianapolis Museum of Art?
When did the Indianapolis Museum of art become a museum?
Who founded the Indianapolis Museum of Art?
Who founded the Art Association of Indianapolis?
Feb 17, 2021 · Charles L. Venable, the director and chief executive of the Indianapolis Museum of Art at Newfields, resigned on Wednesday after apologizing for an insensitive job posting. Lyndon French for...
- Another New Leader for Indianapolis Museum Roiled by Racism ...
Newfields, whose campus includes the museum, announced on...
- Another New Leader for Indianapolis Museum Roiled by Racism ...
Aug 27, 2024 · The Indianapolis Museum of Art at Newfields has named its third president and CEO in four years as it attempts to move past a racism scandal that forced the departure of its longtime leader in...
- Tessa Solomon
Starting in 2007, Newfield's chief executive was referred to as the Melvin and Bren Simon Director and CEO of the Indianapolis Museum of Art (later "of Newfields") in recognition of a $10 million gift from philanthropists Bren and Melvin Simon to endow the position of the director and CEO. [233]
Sep 21, 2023 · The Indianapolis Museum of Art (IMA) at Newfields on September 20 announced that Belinda Tate will assume the role of director, effective November 6. She will be the first person to hold the title of Melvin & Bren Simon Director, which was created in 2021 following a period of upheaval at the museum.
Sep 20, 2023 · Newfields has appointed Belinda Tate the next director of the Indianapolis Museum of Art at Newfield, concluding a nearly four-year hiring process.
- Tessa Solomon
Aug 26, 2024 · Newfields, whose campus includes the museum, announced on Monday that Le Monte G. Booker Sr., the chief financial officer of Chicago’s Field Museum, would serve as its next president and...
May 17, 2022 · Newfields, a sprawling campus that contains the Indianapolis Museum of Art, announced on Tuesday that the educator Colette Pierce Burnette will become its next president and chief executive.